WI SB202 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.57 (3m) (f), 48.57 (3m) (g) 1. (intro.), 48.57 (3n) (f), 48.57 (3n) (g) 1. (intro.), 48.57 (3p) (h) 5. and 48.57 (3p) (hm) of the statutes; Relating to: appeals of denials of kinship care payments based on arrest or conviction record. (FE)
Title
Appeals of denials of kinship care payments based on arrest or conviction record. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 166 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Family Law |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |