WI SB202 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 111.39 (5) (d), 111.397 and 893.995; and to amend 111.39 (4) (d) and 814.04 (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: elimination of compensatory and punitive damages for acts of employment discrimination or unfair honesty or genetic testing. (FE)
Title
Elimination of compensatory and punitive damages for acts of employment discrimination or unfair honesty or genetic testing. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend the rules (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend the rules (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 219 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-1-2012 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2012-02-16 | House | Refused to suspend rules to read a third time, Ayes 58, Noes 37 |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-14 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend the rules, Ayes 55, Noes 37 |
2011-11-03 | House | Read |
2011-11-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Read a third time |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senators Taylor, Hansen, Miller, S. Coggs, C. Larson, Holperin and Carpenter |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-2-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |