WI SB20 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 551.508 (1m) (a) and (c), 551.603 (4) (a) and (c) and 551.604 (4); and to create 551.102 (33) and 551.413 of the statutes; Relating to: financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateRepresentative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
2021-03-03SenateRepresentative Bowen added as a cosponsor
2021-02-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback