WI SB2 | 2017 | January Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 20.455 (2) (en); and to create 20.455 (2) (en) of the statutes; Relating to: treatment and diversion programs and making appropriations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment and diversion programs and making appropriations. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2017-03-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-03-24SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2017-03-22SenateExecutive action taken
2017-03-14SenatePublic hearing held
2017-03-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-02SenateSenator Johnson added as a coauthor
2017-02-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback