WI SB197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 767.451 (5m) (c); to renumber 767.41 (5) (c); to amend 767.41 (2) (e) 1. and 767.451 (5m) (a); and to create 767.41 (5) (c) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: legal custody and physical placement factors for a child of a service member.
Title
Legal custody and physical placement factors for a child of a service member.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-06 | House | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Family Law |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |