WI SB193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 6.15 (6) and 6.21; to renumber and amend 5.84 (1); to amend 5.85 (2) (a), 6.84 (2), 6.86 (1) (ar), 6.88 (3) (b), 6.92 (1), 6.925, 6.94, 6.95, 7.50 (2) (em) and 7.52 (3) (b); and to create 5.84 (1) (b), 6.91 and subchapter VI of chapter 6 [precedes 6.981] of the statutes; Relating to: using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb193 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB193.pdf |