WI SB186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 14.16 (17) of the statutes; Relating to: creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateSenator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
2021-05-11SenateLaid on table
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-11SenateRepresentatives Spreitzer, Subeck, Emerson, Loudenbeck and S. Rodriguez added as cosponsors
2021-05-10SenateSenators Smith and Agard added as coauthors
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-04-30SenateRepresentative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
2021-04-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-04-28SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2021-04-28SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-21SenatePublic hearing held
2021-03-10SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback