WI SB183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: legislative oversight of federal COVID-19 funds.
Title
Legislative oversight of federal COVID-19 funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Point of order that Senate Substitute Amendment 1 was not germane well taken (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Point of order that Senate Substitute Amendment 1 was not germane well taken (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-25-2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 36, Paired 2 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a second time |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2021-03-23 | House | Read |
2021-03-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 12 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Substitute Amendment 1 was not germane well taken, Ayes 18, Noes 12 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Smith, Agard, Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Ringhand, Roys, Wirch and L. Taylor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |