WI SB18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 971.108 and 971.109 of the statutes; Relating to: expediting criminal proceedings when a victim or witness is an elder person and preserving the testimony of a crime victim or witness who is an elder person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expediting criminal proceedings when a victim or witness is an elder person and preserving the testimony of a crime victim or witness who is an elder person.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-02-16SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-02-16SenateRead a second time
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-02-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-02-12SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2021-02-12SenateExecutive action taken
2021-02-11SenatePublic hearing held
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback