WI SB177 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 48.396 (1), 48.396 (2) (a), 48.78 (2) (a), 48.981 (7) (a) 15., 938.396 (1) (a), 938.396 (2) (a) and 938.78 (2) (a); and to create 51.30 (4) (b) 29., 146.82 (2) (d), 250.22 and 961.385 (2) (cm) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: fatality review teams and granting rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fatality review teams and granting rule-making authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-16HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses
2024-02-15HouseLRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
2023-12-06HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2023-11-07HouseReceived from Senate
2023-11-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2023-11-07SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 2
2023-11-07SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2023-11-07SenateOrdered to a third reading
2023-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2023-11-07SenateRead a second time
2023-11-03SenatePlaced on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-10-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-10-13SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
2023-10-13SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
2023-10-12SenateExecutive action taken
2023-09-29SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg
2023-09-20SenatePublic hearing held
2023-04-03SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2023-04-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback