WI SB172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.410 (1) (df) and 301.098 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing and operating community reentry centers and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing and operating community reentry centers and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenatePublished 3-28-2024
2024-03-28SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 233
2024-03-21SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
2024-03-20SenateReport correctly enrolled
2024-03-12SenateAction ordered immediately messaged
2024-03-12SenateAssembly Amendment 1 concurred in
2024-03-11SenatePlaced on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2024-02-22SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2024-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended
2024-02-22HouseRules suspended
2024-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2024-02-22HouseRead a second time
2024-02-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born
2024-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2024-02-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2024-02-13HouseReceived from Senate
2024-02-13SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-13SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 3
2024-02-13SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2024-02-13SenateOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-13SenateRules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
2024-02-13SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance
2024-02-13SenateRead a second time
2024-02-09SenatePlaced on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2024-02-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-02-06SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2024-02-06SenateExecutive action taken
2023-11-02SenatePublic hearing held
2023-05-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-04-03SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-04-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb172
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB172.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2023/REG/SB172.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2023/233.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/SB172-AA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/sb172/sb172_doc.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/senate/judiciary_and_public_safety/1776036.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2023/REG/SB172.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2023/REG/Act%20233.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/sv0231

Bill Comments

feedback