WI SB171 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Published 5-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Published 5-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 97.67 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: inspections of recreational and educational camps. (FE)
Title
Inspections of recreational and educational camps. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Published 5-22-2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 5-21-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 45 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-20-2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |