WI SB169 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 139.06 (4); to renumber and amend 139.06 (1) (b); and to create 139.01 (2t) and 139.06 (1) (b) 2. to 4. of the statutes; Relating to: the tax on intoxicating liquor. (FE)
Title
The tax on intoxicating liquor. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb169 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB169.pdf |