WI SB163 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 38.28 (1m) (a) 1.; and to create 20.292 (1) (aj), 20.292 (1) (fd), 20.292 (1) (fh), 20.292 (1) (fj), 38.04 (33), 38.04 (34), 38.04 (35) and 38.39 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to technical college district boards and technical college faculty, staff, and students and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Grants to technical college district boards and technical college faculty, staff, and students and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb163 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB163.pdf |