WI SB158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 70.47 (7) (aa); to amend 70.05 (4m), 70.47 (2) and 74.37 (4) (a); and to create 70.05 (4n) of the statutes; Relating to: a property owner's right to refuse entry into his or her home for assessment purposes and conditions for appearing before the board of review.
Title
A property owner's right to refuse entry into his or her home for assessment purposes and conditions for appearing before the board of review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb158 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB158.pdf |