WI SB155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 50.03 (14) (c) 1.; and to create 46.284 (4) (km) of the statutes; Relating to: notification of certain facility closures, change in type or level of services or means of reimbursement accepted, and care management organization notification of contract termination with a provider that is a nursing home or community-based residential facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notification of certain facility closures, change in type or level of services or means of reimbursement accepted, and care management organization notification of contract termination with a provider that is a nursing home or community-based residential facility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2024-01-16HouseReceived from Senate
2024-01-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2024-01-16SenateRead a third time and passed
2024-01-16SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2024-01-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2024-01-16SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2024-01-16SenateRead a second time
2024-01-12SenatePlaced on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-12-01SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-12-01SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1
2023-12-01SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
2023-11-30SenateExecutive action taken
2023-11-27SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
2023-09-20SenatePublic hearing held
2023-05-04SenateRepresentatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors
2023-04-03SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2023-04-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback