WI SB154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.927 (1r) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting performance of and funding or providing property for abortions and other services by certain employees and entities. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting performance of and funding or providing property for abortions and other services by certain employees and entities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb154 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB154.pdf |