WI SB149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 893.43, 893.54 (intro.) and 893.54 (1) and (2); to amend 893.52; and to create 893.43 (2) and 893.54 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: statutes of limitation on claims involving property damage and on claims arising from a motor vehicle accident and covered by a motor vehicle insurance policy.
Title
Statutes of limitation on claims involving property damage and on claims arising from a motor vehicle accident and covered by a motor vehicle insurance policy.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb149 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB149.pdf |