WI SB143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 941.295 (2) (d) 1.; and to create 941.295 (2g) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: going armed with an electric weapon by private security personnel.
Title
Going armed with an electric weapon by private security personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senator Feyen added as a coauthor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb143 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB143.pdf |