WI SB138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.08 (1) (intro.) and 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (cc) and 71.07 (8n) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth. (FE)
Title
Creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb138 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB138.pdf |