WI SB138 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 609.72 and 632.799 of the statutes; Relating to: information to be provided by insurers about health care plans offered on the American health benefit exchange.
Title
Information to be provided by insurers about health care plans offered on the American health benefit exchange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report rejection of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb138 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB138.pdf |