WI SB135 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 89.073 (1), 89.073 (2m), 440.09 (1) and 440.09 (2m); to amend 89.073 (title), 89.073 (2) (b), 440.09 (title) and 440.09 (2) (b); and to create 440.09 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: reciprocal credentials. (FE)
Title
Reciprocal credentials. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11 |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senator Roys withdrawn as a coauthor |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-08-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |