WI SB133 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.225 (2) (j) and 940.225 (5) (abm) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual assault by a health care provider and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual assault by a health care provider and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Representatives Cabrera and O'Connor added as cosponsors |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |