WI SB132 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (57) (c) and 36.27 (1) (a); and to create 36.27 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition and fees. (FE)
Title
University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition and fees. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Bob Donovan [R] | Rep. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |