WI SB132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-16)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-16)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 100.52 (6); to amend 100.52 (10) (a) and 100.52 (10) (b); and to create 100.52 (1) (bd), 100.52 (4) (a) 4., 100.52 (4) (a) 5., 100.52 (6) (c), 100.52 (10) (c) and 100.523 of the statutes; Relating to: caller ID spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Caller ID spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb132 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB132.pdf |