WI SB126 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.07 (8m) and 71.10 (4) (cs) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit for certain expenses incurred by a family caregiver to assist a qualified family member. (FE)
Title
Creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit for certain expenses incurred by a family caregiver to assist a qualified family member. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb126 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB126.pdf |