WI SB124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.455 (2) (cp) and 165.989 of the statutes; Relating to: community-oriented policing-house grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Community-oriented policing-house grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Sylvia Ortiz-Velez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Published 6-23-2021 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-22-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 51 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-22-2021 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-19 | House | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-13 | House | Representative Duchow added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 25, Noes 8 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |