WI SB121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.0511 (1); to amend 66.0511 (2); and to create 66.0511 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting use of choke holds by law enforcement officers in use of force policies. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting use of choke holds by law enforcement officers in use of force policies. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenatePublished 6-23-2021
2021-06-23SenateReport approved by the Governor on 6-22-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 48
2021-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor on 6-22-2021
2021-06-17SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-06-16SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-06-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-16HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2021-06-16HouseRules suspended
2021-06-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-16HouseRead a second time
2021-06-16HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2021-06-14HouseRead first time and referred to calendar of 6-16-2021
2021-06-10HouseReceived from Senate
2021-06-09SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-09SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2021-06-09SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-06-09SenateRules suspended
2021-06-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-09SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2021-06-09SenateRead a second time
2021-06-04SenatePlaced on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-28SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-26SenateRepresentative Drake added as a cosponsor
2021-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2021-05-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2021-05-06SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2021-04-20SenateRepresentative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
2021-03-18SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-18SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback