WI SB117 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 19.37 (2) (a); and to create 19.37 (2) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining attorney fees and costs under the state's public records law when an authority voluntarily or unilaterally releases a contested record after an action has been filed in court.
Title
Obtaining attorney fees and costs under the state's public records law when an authority voluntarily or unilaterally releases a contested record after an action has been filed in court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-24 | House | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-03 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |