WI SB115 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-8)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.33 (1) (a) 1. f. of the statutes; Relating to: requiring one-half credit of personal financial literacy for high school graduation. (FE)
Title
Requiring one-half credit of personal financial literacy for high school graduation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-22 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Representative Myers added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |