WI SB1102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 43.75 and 118.073 of the statutes; Relating to: pupil or minor access to harmful material in public libraries and public schools. (FE)
Title
Pupil or minor access to harmful material in public libraries and public schools. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Sen. Jesse James [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |