WI SB110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.528 of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption from civil liability related to the placement of buoys or other markers in waterways.
Title
An exemption from civil liability related to the placement of buoys or other markers in waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | Senate | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 91 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-09-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a second time |
2015-09-24 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-09-22 | House | Placed on calendar 9-24-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators L. Taylor, Harris Dodd and Risser |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |