WI SB11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 102.17 (4) and 102.58; to amend 102.04 (2m), 102.13 (2) (a), 102.29 (6m) (a) 3., 102.315 (1) (c), 102.315 (2), 102.42 (1), 102.49 (5) (b), 102.49 (5) (c) and 102.49 (5) (e); and to create 102.04 (2g), 102.17 (9), 102.29 (6m) (a) 1m., 102.315 (2e), 102.315 (2m), 102.315 (2s), 102.42 (1p), 102.44 (7) and 102.49 (5) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Published 4-28-2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-27-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 29 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-04-12 | House | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-04-08 | House | Representative S. Rodriguez added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-04 | House | Representatives Steffen and Krug added as cosponsors |
2021-02-23 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-19 | House | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-18 | House | Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Johnson |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Representatives Spreitzer and Shelton added as cosponsors |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |