WI SB1074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 104.001 of the statutes; Relating to: local minimum wage ordinances. (FE)
Title
Local minimum wage ordinances. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |