WI SB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 13.176 of the statutes; Relating to: appointing delegates for a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Title
Appointing delegates for a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Representative Jarchow withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb107 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB107.pdf |