WI SB1065 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.60 and 299.97 (2); and to create 13.59, 20.855 (4) (fb), 25.44 and 299.87 of the statutes; Relating to: creating the water fund for our future and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating the water fund for our future and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |