WI SB105 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 60.85 (2) (b) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: limited authorization for the town of Rome in Adams County to make cash grants or loan subsidies to owners, lessees, or developers of land located in a tax incremental district created by the town. (FE)
Title
Limited authorization for the town of Rome in Adams County to make cash grants or loan subsidies to owners, lessees, or developers of land located in a tax incremental district created by the town. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Executive session held |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb105 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB105.pdf |