WI SB105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 224.50 of the statutes; relating to: payment card network fees for merchants and providing a penalty.
Title
Payment card network fees for merchants and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-11-04 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-26 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb105 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB105.pdf |