WI SB104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.225 (2) (k) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual contact by a law enforcement officer with a person in his or her custody and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual contact by a law enforcement officer with a person in his or her custody and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb104 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB104.pdf |