WI SB100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-30)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 40.51 (15m), 632.86 and 632.865 (title) and (1); to renumber 632.865 (2); to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 601.43 (1) (a), 609.83, 616.09 (1) (a) 2. and 628.36 (2m) (e) 1.; and to create 628.36 (2m) (a) 2s., 632.861 and chapter 649 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and regulation of pharmacy benefit managers, drug pricing transparency, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration and regulation of pharmacy benefit managers, drug pricing transparency, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors

Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Roger Roth [R]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]
Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]
Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]
Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]
Sen. Robert Cowles [R]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Mark Born [R]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Ed Brooks [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]
Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]
Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]
Rep. Rob Hutton [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]Rep. David Murphy [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R]
Rep. Kevin Petersen [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]
Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]
Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. Rob Stafsholt [R]
Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Amanda Stuck [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]
Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]
Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Nancy Vander Meer [R]Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]
Rep. Don Vruwink [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26SenateRepresentative Milroy added as a cosponsor
2019-09-12SenateSenator Risser added as a coauthor
2019-09-06SenateRepresentative Billings added as a cosponsor
2019-09-04SenateRepresentatives Magnafici and Crowley added as cosponsors
2019-08-29SenateSenator Schachtner added as a coauthor
2019-08-23SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2019-08-20SenateRepresentatives Pronschinske and Kulp added as cosponsors
2019-06-21SenateRepresentative Wittke added as a cosponsor
2019-05-09SenateSenator Miller added as a coauthor
2019-05-08SenateRepresentatives Gruszynski and Vining added as cosponsors
2019-04-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-02SenateCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2019-04-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-29SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-27SenateRepresentative Tusler added as a cosponsor
2019-03-20SenateSenator Bewley added as a coauthor
2019-03-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback