WI SB1 | 2018 | January Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 49.79 (9) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: required hours of participation in the FoodShare employment and training program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required hours of participation in the FoodShare employment and training program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-15SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-15SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-02-14SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-13SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2018-01-31SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-26SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
2018-01-26SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback