WI SB1 | 2014 | January Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Published 3-25-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: reducing the lowest individual income tax rate; providing technical college property tax relief aid; establishing a technical college district revenue limit; the carry-back of net operating losses; the sales and use tax exemption for commercial printing; the jobs tax credit; the electronic medical records credit; the manufacturing and agriculture credit; the research credit; the state historic rehabilitation credit; the relocated business credit; and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the lowest individual income tax rate; providing technical college property tax relief aid; establishing a technical college district revenue limit; the carry-back of net operating losses; the sales and use tax exemption for commercial printing; the jobs tax credit; the electronic medical records credit; the manufacturing and agriculture credit; the research credit; the state historic rehabilitation credit; the relocated business credit; and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 3 rejected (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24SenatePublished 3-25-2014
2014-03-24SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-24-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 145
2014-03-21SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-21-2014
2014-03-21SenateReport correctly enrolled
2014-03-19SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2014-03-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2014-03-18HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 61, Noes 35
2014-03-18HouseRules suspended
2014-03-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2014-03-18HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38
2014-03-18HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca, Pasch, Mason, Jorgensen, Zamarripa and Hulsey
2014-03-18HouseRead a second time
2014-03-18HouseLRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
2014-03-06HouseReferred to calendar of 3-18-2014 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93
2014-03-04HouseReceived from Senate
2014-03-04SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2014-03-04SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 15
2014-03-04SenateRules suspended
2014-03-04SenateOrdered to a third reading
2014-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2014-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 15
2014-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2014-03-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2014-03-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2014-03-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2014-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 3 offered by Senators T. Cullen, L. Taylor, Carpenter, Miller, Lehman, Vinehout, Hansen, C. Larson, Lassa, Risser and Wirch
2014-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Hansen
2014-03-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senators C. Larson, Risser, Wirch, Lassa, Hansen, Erpenbach, Harris and T. Cullen
2014-03-04SenateRead a second time
2014-03-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Vinehout
2014-02-27SenatePlaced on calendar 3-4-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2014-02-25SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout
2014-02-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2014-02-20SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2014-02-20SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2014-02-20SenateReport introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2014-02-19SenateExecutive action taken
2014-02-19SenatePublic hearing held
2014-02-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2014-01-31SenateFiscal estimate received
2014-01-31SenateFiscal estimate received
2014-01-30SenateRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2014-01-30SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/jr4/sen/bill/sb1
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/JR4/SB1.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2013/JR4/SB1.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2013/145.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0277
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0278
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0279
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0280
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0281
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/sv0282
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/av0374
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2013/av0375

Bill Comments 750

feedback