WI SB1 | 2013 | October Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - Published 10-21-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - Published 10-21-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: school district budgets and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
School district budgets and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-17 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Senate | Published 10-21-2013 |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 10-20-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 46 |
2013-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 10-18-2013 |
2013-10-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-10-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-10-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 82, Noes 12 |
2013-10-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 32 |
2013-10-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Hulsey |
2013-10-17 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 57, Noes 38 |
2013-10-17 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2013-10-17 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 is not properly before the Assembly under Assembly Rule 93 (1) well taken |
2013-10-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Smith, Genrich, Sargent, Ringhand, Hintz, Hebl, Wright, Kolste, Pasch, Hesselbein, Barca, Bernard Schaber, Hulsey, Kahl, Young, Shankland, Zamarripa, Sinicki, C. Taylor, Johnson, Ohnstad and Jorgensen |
2013-10-17 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to calendar of 10-17-2013 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2013-10-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 5 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Point of order that Senate amendment 3 not germane well taken |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators T. Cullen, Risser, Jauch, Lehman and Miller |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |