WI AR17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: condemning the mass shooting that occurred in Las Vegas, Nevada, on October 1, 2017.
Title
Condemning the mass shooting that occurred in Las Vegas, Nevada, on October 1, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-02 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2017-10-31 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/resolution/ar17 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AR17.pdf |