WI AR12 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 9-19-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 9-19-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Arthur L. Peterson.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Representative Arthur L. Peterson.
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] | Rep. Jodi Emerson [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 9-19-2023 |
2023-09-13 | House | Report correctly engrossed on 9-13-2023 |
2023-09-12 | House | Adopted |
2023-09-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-09-07 | House | Placed on calendar 9-12-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-05-25 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced |