WI AR11 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-16-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-16-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Joanne Duren.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Representative Joanne Duren.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Sue Conley [D] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-16-2023 |
2023-06-12 | House | Report correctly engrossed on 6-12-2023 |
2023-06-07 | House | Adopted |
2023-06-01 | House | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-05-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-05-12 | House | Introduced |