WI AR1 | 2017 | August Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-05 - Representatives Tittl and Krug added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-05 - Representatives Tittl and Krug added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: condemning the violence that occurred in Charlottesville, Virginia, on August 12, 2017.
Title
Condemning the violence that occurred in Charlottesville, Virginia, on August 12, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-05 | House | Representatives Tittl and Krug added as coauthors |
2017-08-31 | House | Representatives R. Brooks, Weatherston, Spiros, Edming, Mursau, Pronschinske, Thiesfeldt, Bernier, Felzkowski, Ballweg and Summerfield added as coauthors |
2017-08-24 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2017-08-22 | House | Representative Meyers added as a coauthor |
2017-08-17 | House | Representatives Crowley, Spreitzer, Vruwink, Subeck, Billings, Anderson, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Fields, Genrich, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Mason, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Stuck, C. Taylor, Wachs, Young, Zepnick, Snyder, Vorpagel, Allen, Jacque, Rohrkaste, Kulp, Kitchens, Duchow, Tranel, Petersen, Swearingen and Nerison added as coauthors |
2017-08-17 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2017-08-17 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-08-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/au7/asm/resolution/ar1 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/AU7/AR1.pdf |