WI AJR97 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating and commending the athletes, coaches, and staff at the University of Wisconsin-Whitewater on their accomplishments.
Title
Congratulating and commending the athletes, coaches, and staff at the University of Wisconsin-Whitewater on their accomplishments.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2021-11-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-11-12 | House | Introduced |