WI AJR97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 24 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating the one-year anniversary of the Chippewa Falls Girl Scout Tragedy.
Title
Commemorating the one-year anniversary of the Chippewa Falls Girl Scout Tragedy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Concurred in |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Adopted |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-31 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced |