WI AJR93 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the friendship between Wisconsin and Turkey.
Title
Honoring the friendship between Wisconsin and Turkey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Representatives Barca, Wachs, Bernier and Pope added as coauthors |
2014-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-14 | House | Representative Mason added as a coauthor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-10 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr93 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AJR93.pdf |